U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • August 19, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Brief]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Opposition]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Opposition]
  • October 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 19, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 31, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • February 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Petition for Review]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.