U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Polk v. Swift et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Joinder - Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • May 04, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Lift Stay]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 12, 2021: [Stay Case]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 02, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 01, 2020: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Response]
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 15, 2020: [Compel]
  • September 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Reply Brief]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Compel]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Response]
  • August 14, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Quash]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 28, 2020: [Vacate]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.