U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Delong v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Closing Case]
  • July 30, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 30, 2020: [Response]
  • July 16, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • July 15, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Status Report Order]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 24, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 24, 2019: [Compel]
  • July 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 18, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • July 18, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • July 17, 2019: [Removal]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.