U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Puskarich v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 29, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2022: [New Trial]
  • July 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Objection]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Deposition]
  • June 16, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • June 16, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 16, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 16, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 13, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 09, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 05, 2022: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • June 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 02, 2022: [Designation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 02, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Designation]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Verdict]
  • June 01, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Verdict]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 17, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • March 11, 2022: [Response]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • February 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Bifurcate]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 14, 2022: [Designation]
  • January 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 29, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Vacate]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Vacate]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 22, 2020: [Brief]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 11, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 22, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 22, 2019: [Vacate]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 05, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • July 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.