U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Smith v. Cheyenne Retirement Investors LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Transcript - SEALED]
  • May 13, 2021: [Response]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Show Cause]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Mediation]
  • February 25, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 25, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • February 24, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 11, 2021: [In Limine]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 09, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • March 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 09, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 27, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • September 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.