U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Thorbus v. H H Williams Trucking LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 22, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Response]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 04, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 14, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 29, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 07, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • January 03, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 14, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 11, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 02, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • November 16, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 05, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.