U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Cowboy Midstream LLC v. King Operating Fund
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 27, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 04, 2020: [Financial Entry]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 23, 2019: [Quash]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.