U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02008
  • Case Name: Whitmire v. Wolf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Decision and Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Addendum]
  • February 23, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • February 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • February 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • February 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • February 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • February 12, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • February 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • February 08, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • February 08, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • February 08, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • February 02, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • December 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • December 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 20, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • October 19, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • October 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 16, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 15, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • October 13, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • September 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • August 17, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • June 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
  • June 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • June 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • June 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • June 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • June 05, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • June 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 01, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • May 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • May 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • December 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party ]
  • December 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • December 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacate]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Quash]
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • November 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • November 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • November 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Quash]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • October 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
  • September 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.