U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Freshwater et al v. Frontier Tire LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 13, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.