U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20503
  • Case Name: Joshua Donald Horsley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.