U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00160
  • Case Name: UniControl Inc v. ELA Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • August 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.