U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Wyoming Department of Health and Social Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • October 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 22, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 18, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 18, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 08, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Strike]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 17, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response]
  • August 16, 2020: [Opposition]
  • August 14, 2020: [Quash]
  • August 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response]
  • July 14, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 13, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 13, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Brief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 08, 2020: [Response]
  • July 07, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 29, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • May 29, 2020: [Designation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.