U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Whittecar v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 18, 2019: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 15, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.