U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Eagle Bear et al v. Harvey MD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 19, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 21, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 31, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 24, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Quash]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 16, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 01, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • April 01, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 30, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 20, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 19, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 19, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 09, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • September 09, 2019: [Praecipe]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • August 08, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • August 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.