U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Noch v. Independent Film Development Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Remanding Case to State Court]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 19, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 19, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Removal]
  • August 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.