U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Sedda et al v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 22, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Vacating Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 27, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 18, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • November 13, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.