U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Nelson v. First American Title Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 04, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 13, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 19, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 12, 2019: [Removal]
  • August 12, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.