U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Gifford et al v. Victory 1 Roofing and Construction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 25, 2020: [Response]
  • September 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 11, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 20, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 12, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 22, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 09, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 09, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • September 09, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 27, 2019: [Removal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.