U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hauptman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Default Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 24, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.