U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Lux v. Erickson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 08, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • April 17, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 07, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • September 04, 2019: [Removal]
  • September 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 27, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.