U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00179
  • Case Name: American Certified Brands LLC v. Jennings
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 08, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 11, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 17, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • September 17, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • August 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.