U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00181
  • Case Name: Chapin v. Rebellion Energy II LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 23, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 20, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Removal]
  • September 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 10, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 10, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.