U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Lebar Ranch Minerals LLC v. Chesapeake Operating LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 16, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 11, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 09, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2019: [Removal]
  • September 05, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.