U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Jean-Louis v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 12, 2025: [Letter(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 04, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.