U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 19, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 06, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • September 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Removal]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Complaint]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.