U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00188
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Black
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Response]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter(s)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter(s)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 16, 2022: [Quash]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Application for Writ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [In Court Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • September 21, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Closing Case]
  • March 13, 2020: [Consent Decree]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.