U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Redfield v. Campbell County Health et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Lift Stay]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 06, 2021: [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Compel]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Response]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 13, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • January 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Bifurcate]
  • November 13, 2020: [Bifurcate]
  • November 04, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.