U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Harris v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
  • April 02, 2021: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • February 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 21, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • January 02, 2020: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Response]
  • October 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.