U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Foltz v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institution Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 10, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Response]
  • April 02, 2020: [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • February 05, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • October 15, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 10, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 07, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.