U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00197
  • Case Name: DeLoge v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institution Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 22, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 28, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2020: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.