U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Matt Betts Trucking Inc v. Black Barrel Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 22, 2020: [Response]
  • July 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 15, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 01, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 17, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 24, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • September 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.