U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Mountain Pursuit v. United States Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 07, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Status Report Order]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Financial Entry]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.