U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Roeber v. Gateway Foundation Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Letter(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • September 03, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 28, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 11, 2020: [Opposition]
  • March 03, 2020: [Opposition]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • February 26, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • February 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 19, 2020: [Response]
  • February 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 18, 2020: [Intervene]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 07, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 07, 2020: [Brief]
  • February 07, 2020: [Opposition]
  • February 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 06, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 03, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 30, 2020: [Intervene]
  • January 30, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 29, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 23, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Opposition]
  • January 21, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 15, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Recusal]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2020: [Intervene]
  • January 03, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • January 02, 2020: [Letter(s)]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2019: [Intervene]
  • December 19, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • December 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 17, 2019: [Intervene]
  • December 17, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Intervene]
  • December 16, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 11, 2019: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • December 09, 2019: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 06, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2019: [Intervene]
  • December 04, 2019: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 04, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2019: [Intervene]
  • December 03, 2019: [Letter(s)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Service of Process]
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2019: [Intervene]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 18, 2019: [Intervene]
  • November 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • November 14, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 14, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2019: [Letter(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Complexity]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2019: [Intervene]
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2019: [Intervene]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Intervene]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Intervene]
  • October 10, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Expedite]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Intervene]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Supplement]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 26, 2019: [Service of Process]
  • September 26, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.