U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Collier v. Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2020: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 27, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Strike]
  • August 27, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 27, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 26, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Dismissing Party]
  • July 14, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 22, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2020: [Compel]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 18, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 17, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • December 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Minute Order]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 07, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • October 07, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • October 01, 2019: [Removal]
  • October 01, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.