U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Bextel v. Bryner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 17, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply to Response]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 29, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 22, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • October 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.