U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Everson v. Snider
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Mediation]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 01, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • April 13, 2020: [Response]
  • April 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 26, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 04, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.