U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Atchison Ranch LLC v. Anadarko Land Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 15, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Designation]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • May 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • October 16, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • October 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2019: [Removal]
  • October 07, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.