U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Jonah Gas Company LLC et al v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Statement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 02, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 04, 2019: [Recusal]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • October 14, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2019: [Removal]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.