U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Druse v. Alota Sand & Gravel Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Witness List]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Brief]
  • February 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 28, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: [Praecipe]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • October 10, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 10, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • October 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.