U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Study v. Peabody Investments Corp and Affiliates Welfare Benefit Plan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 20, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 20, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • January 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.