U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00212
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ginn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 29, 2020: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response]
  • November 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.