U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Collins et al v. Reichert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • June 10, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 05, 2020: [(TRMD)Leave to]
  • June 04, 2020: [(TRMD)Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 03, 2020: [(TRMD)Leave to]
  • June 03, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 01, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 28, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2019: [Removal]
  • October 16, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.