U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Wyo-Ben Inc v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 23, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 23, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Bifurcate]
  • March 19, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • January 03, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 02, 2020: [Reply Brief]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Response]
  • December 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 17, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • October 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.