U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Spencer Irrevocable Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Remand]
  • November 20, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 12, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • November 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2019: [Removal]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.