U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Virgin Enterprises Limited v. Virginic LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 19, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 29, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 09, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 08, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 06, 2020: [Entry of Default]
  • June 01, 2020: [Status Report Order]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 01, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response]
  • March 18, 2020: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Expedite]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 10, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 06, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 06, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 16, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Add Party]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Praecipe]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.