U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Knight v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • December 27, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 25, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • October 25, 2019: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.