U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Henley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 29, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Staying Case]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 10, 2020: [Stay Case]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 07, 2020: [Financial Entry]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • October 25, 2019: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.