U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Walgreen Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 06, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 06, 2020: [Vacate]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 26, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Objection]
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • November 07, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Removal]
  • October 25, 2019: [Complaint]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.