U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00225
  • Case Name: CVK Electric LLC v. ELA Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 02, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 24, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 24, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.