U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Everett v. Vitek Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 27, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 20, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 08, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.